Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/10/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/10/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/07/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/07/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/26/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/05/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 09/14/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/21/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/21/2011