Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/08/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/09/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/09/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/10/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/11/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/11/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/16/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/17/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/01/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/01/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/01/2011