Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/22/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/22/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/22/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/26/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/26/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/26/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/26/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/26/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/30/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/30/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/30/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/10/2012