Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/15/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/06/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/06/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/03/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/25/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/25/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/07/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/07/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/07/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/19/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/12/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 08/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/04/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/22/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/22/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/22/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/15/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/19/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/18/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/24/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/14/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/01/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/01/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/22/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/18/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/06/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/11/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/23/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2012