Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/01/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/08/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/08/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/15/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/15/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/17/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/07/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/07/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/07/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/07/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/07/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/07/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/02/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/31/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/02/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/23/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/23/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/23/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/29/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/29/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/04/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/12/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/07/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/20/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/20/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/12/2012