Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/01/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/09/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/19/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/19/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/17/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/02/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/02/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/02/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/02/2012