Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/08/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/08/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/12/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/12/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/18/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/26/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/18/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/21/2012