Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/08/2011