Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/28/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/08/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/08/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/09/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/10/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/04/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/04/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/08/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/08/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/14/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/03/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/02/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/24/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/24/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/27/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/19/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/13/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/21/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 11/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/18/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/10/2012