Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/02/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/02/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/03/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/10/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/16/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/16/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/16/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/04/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/06/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/21/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/20/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 12/23/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/10/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/10/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 01/25/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/10/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/16/2012