Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/17/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/28/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/02/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/02/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/17/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/01/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/05/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/04/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/31/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/15/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/15/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/16/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/21/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 06/24/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/20/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/26/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/20/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/20/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/29/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/29/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 10/03/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/12/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/24/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/25/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/31/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/04/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/15/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2012