Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/29/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/09/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/06/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/12/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/18/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/17/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2012