Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/13/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/14/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/14/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/14/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/14/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/27/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/28/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/29/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/13/2012