Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (01/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on January 1, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Space Exploration Sustainability Act - Amends the National Aeronautics and Space Administration Authorization Act of 2010 to express the sense of Congress that the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) shall proceed with the use of the International Space Station (ISS), technology development, and follow-on transportation systems (including the space launch system and the multipurpose crew vehicle) in a manner ensuring: (1) that these capabilities remain inherently complementary and interrelated; (2) a balance of the development, sustainment, and use of each of these capabilities, which are of critical importance to the viability and sustainability of the U.S. space program; and (3) that resources required to support the timely and sustainable development of these capabilities authorized in either title III or title IV of such Act are not derived from a reduction in resources for the capabilities authorized in the other title.

Extends, through December 31, 2013, the authority of the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to pay compensation for claims in excess of a commercial space launcher's required insurance coverage.

Amends the Iran, North Korea, and Syria Nonproliferation Act to remove the purchase of goods or services relating to human space flight not required to be made under a contract or other agreement in effect on January 1, 1999, from the definition of "extraordinary payments in connection with the International Space Station" which federal agencies are prohibited from making to the Russian Aviation and Space Agency (RASA) and organizations or entities under its jurisdiction unless the President makes specified determinations regarding Russian cooperation in preventing weapons proliferation relating to Iran, North Korea, and Syria. (Thus waives the presidential determination requirement for federal agency payments to RASA for the purchase of any goods or services relating to human space flight.)

Extends from July 1, 2016, to December 31, 2020, the current exception to the presidential determination requirement for payments for work to be performed or services to be rendered for work on the ISS before such date necessary to meet U.S. obligations under the Agreement Concerning Cooperation on the Civil International Space Station.