Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/02/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/02/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 10/02/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/02/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/02/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/02/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/12/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/12/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/26/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 12/04/2012