Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/19/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/26/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/26/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 10/26/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/26/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/26/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/26/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/26/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/04/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/19/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew