Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/05/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/05/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/26/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/18/2012