Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/18/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/18/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/18/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/18/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 09/18/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/21/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/21/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/02/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/02/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/02/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/02/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/09/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/09/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/16/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/16/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/13/2012