Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/19/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/19/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/19/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 09/19/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/19/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/19/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/19/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/20/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/20/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/26/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/26/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/26/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/26/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/26/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2012
Rep. Curson, David Alan [D-MI-11] 12/04/2012