Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 08/02/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 08/02/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/10/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/20/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2012