Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/26/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/26/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/26/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/31/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 07/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/13/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/13/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/13/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/05/2012