Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/19/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/19/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/14/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/19/2012