Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/23/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/25/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/25/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/26/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/26/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/31/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/31/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/31/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/31/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/31/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/13/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/21/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/09/2012