Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/19/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/19/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/19/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/19/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/19/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 07/19/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/23/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/24/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/24/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/24/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/24/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/24/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/24/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/25/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/25/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/31/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/31/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/02/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/10/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/21/2012