Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/09/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 07/09/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 07/09/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/09/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/09/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/13/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/30/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2012