Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 06/21/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/12/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/05/2012