Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/28/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/28/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/09/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/25/2012