Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/20/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/20/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/20/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/27/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2012