Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/07/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/28/2012