Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 06/07/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/15/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/15/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/15/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/20/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/21/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/21/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/21/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/26/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/26/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/27/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/28/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/29/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/29/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/30/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/19/2012