Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/17/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/21/2012