Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/17/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/14/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/18/2012