Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/01/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/07/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/07/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/19/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/19/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/21/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/27/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/05/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew