Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/01/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/01/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/01/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/01/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/01/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/07/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/12/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/18/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/21/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/27/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/28/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/12/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/12/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/17/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/26/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/31/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/20/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/28/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/12/2012