Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/15/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/15/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/29/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/29/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/29/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 08/07/2012