Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/03/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/10/2011