Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/04/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/23/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/06/2011