Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/01/2012