Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/26/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/26/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/27/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/27/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/07/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/07/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/07/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/20/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2012