Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011