Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/24/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/24/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 04/27/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/10/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/10/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/10/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/10/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/18/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/18/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/08/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/08/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/08/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/08/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/08/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/08/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/21/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/29/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/12/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/12/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/25/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/25/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/16/2012