Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/07/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/07/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/06/2012