Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/28/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/29/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/26/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/10/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/10/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/20/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/28/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/28/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/06/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/06/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/28/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/29/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/30/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/30/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/17/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/17/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/02/2013