Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/19/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 04/26/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 05/09/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/09/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/15/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/15/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/17/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/18/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 05/18/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/30/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/30/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/30/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/30/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/31/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/31/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/01/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/01/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/06/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 06/06/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/06/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/06/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/06/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/07/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/07/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/07/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/07/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/07/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/12/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/18/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 06/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/20/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/20/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/25/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/25/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/25/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/25/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/25/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/25/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/25/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/27/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/28/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/28/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 06/29/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/29/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/29/2012