Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/21/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/12/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/12/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/12/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/04/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/04/2012