Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/09/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/28/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/28/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/02/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/10/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/12/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2012