Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/10/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/10/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/30/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/30/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/30/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/31/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/07/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/07/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/07/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/07/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/07/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/08/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/18/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/26/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 07/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/10/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/26/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/02/2012