Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/11/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/13/2011