Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/18/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 05/31/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/31/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/31/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/31/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/05/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/26/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/09/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/09/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/11/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/11/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/13/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/13/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/17/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/23/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/30/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/30/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/10/2012