Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/09/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/09/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/09/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/09/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 02/09/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/09/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/09/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/10/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/10/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/10/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/10/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/10/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/14/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 02/17/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/02/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/08/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/08/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/03/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/03/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/04/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/06/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/11/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 06/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/06/2011